Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 591 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4329 Week
» 1842 Month
» 229726 Year
» 1451291 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #549
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6189   22/08/1924
O4 6192   02/04/1927
O4 5332   12/1929
O4 6365   11/06/1932
O4 6509   21/07/1934
O4 6362   30/01/1937
O4 6367   29/07/1939
O4 6634   31/01/1942