Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1096 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18899 Week
» 71915 Month
» 191442 Year
» 3218295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3317
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
5332 |
|
02/1938 |
O4 |
5069 |
|
08/03/1941 |
O4 |
6556 |
|
23/10/1943 |
O4 |
3649 |
|
02/08/1947 |
O4 |
63753 |
|
11/03/1950 |
|