Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 75 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 23211 Month
» 23211 Year
» 1244776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3260
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6517   05/09/1936
O4 5333   19/11/1938
O4 5332   02/1941
O4 5001   12/06/1943
O4 3510   01/06/1946
O4 63723   08/01/1949