Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 933 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4532 Week
» 10666 Month
» 238550 Year
» 1460115 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1965
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6258   17/05/1924
O4 5333   21/02/1931
O4 6306   20/08/1932
O4 6525   21/07/1934
O4 6355   03/10/1936
O4 6521   22/04/1939
O4 6357   17/01/1942