Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 508 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1757 Week
» 22199 Month
» 359045 Year
» 1580610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1008
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2135   09/1919
O4 6201   06/10/1931
O4 5352   10/11/1934
O4 5333   24/10/1936
O4 6294   23/12/1938
O4 6255   07/06/1941