Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 177 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 11357 Month
» 319338 Year
» 1203719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #943
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5334   21/12/1929
O4 5396   20/02/1932
O4 5389   01/09/1934
O4 5408   24/06/1936
O4 5011   16/07/1938
O4 6363   12/04/1941
O4 6231   21/08/1943
O4 6367   15/09/1945