Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 559 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1808 Week
» 22250 Month
» 359096 Year
» 1580661 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1134
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6364   16/06/1934
O4 6525   01/08/1936
O4 5334   29/10/1938
O4 5352   31/05/1941
O4 6324   05/06/1943
O4 5377   15/12/1945
O4 3842   24/01/1948