Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 347 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3895 Week
» 4785 Month
» 312766 Year
» 1197147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3226
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6586   14/12/1935
O4 5380   09/07/1938
O4 6220   08/1940
O4 6617   24/10/1942
O4 5334   30/10/1943
O4 3847   12/05/1947
O4 63900   25/02/1950