Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 447 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6423 Week
» 12557 Month
» 240441 Year
» 1462006 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3216
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6317   26/10/1935
O4 6555   05/02/1938
O4 6617   01/06/1940
O4 6278   21/11/1942
O4 5396   28/04/1945
O4 3639   27/11/1947
O4 63598   10/09/1949