Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 106 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5199 Week
» 7781 Month
» 272414 Year
» 1493979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1746
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 26   22/06/1918
O4 8   21/09/1923
O4 5355   21/08/1926
O4 5406   01/01/1931
O4 6353   25/03/1933