Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 616 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4215 Week
» 10349 Month
» 238233 Year
» 1459798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1445
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 405   04/1912
O4 6281   24/07/1924
O4 6310   13/07/1929
O4 5026   16/06/1931
O4 6282   09/06/1934