Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1087 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8547 Week
» 6060 Month
» 233944 Year
» 1455509 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1067
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5350   24/03/1934
O4 5026   19/12/1936
O4 6225   20/01/1940
O4 6254   07/04/1944
O4 3767   26/04/1947
O4 63728   13/08/1949