Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 516 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1615 Week
» 7749 Month
» 235633 Year
» 1457198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1876
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2104   06/1919
O4 271   26/03/1921
O4 6579   05/03/1931
O4 6293   06/05/1933
O4 5093   17/08/1935
O4 5069   05/03/1938
O4 6513   22/03/1941
O4 6518   15/05/1943