Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 418 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7425 Week
» 13559 Month
» 241443 Year
» 1463008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1438
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 102   01/1912
O4 354   09/09/1916
O4 1202   20/10/1923
O4 6189   23/04/1927
O4 6362   06/02/1932