Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 414 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1753 Week
» 31251 Month
» 368097 Year
» 1589662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #547
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6269   10/07/1924
O4 5382   17/10/1931
O4 6528   19/05/1934
O4 5414   14/11/1936
O4 5102   25/02/1939