Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3293
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6274   12/06/1937
O4 6377   08/07/1939
O4 5395   31/01/1942
O4 5102   17/05/1944
O4 3782   25/01/1947
O4 63668   02/07/1949