Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1074 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2108 Week
» 24614 Month
» 327804 Year
» 1549369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3261
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6375   26/09/1936
O4 6305   07/02/1942
O4 6370   18/03/1944
O4 3614   25/01/1947
O4 63601   03/09/1949