Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1226 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7615 Week
» 28057 Month
» 364903 Year
» 1586468 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1205
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1870   04/1918
O4 6199   07/04/1925
O4 5133   18/08/1930
O4 6514   18/03/1933
O4 6593   18/05/1935
O4 5407   24/07/1937