Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1827 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19630 Week
» 72646 Month
» 192173 Year
» 3219026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1457
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
1191 |
|
08/1912 |
O4 |
6506 |
|
05/01/1929 |
O4 |
6640 |
|
24/03/1931 |
O4 |
6295 |
|
26/08/1933 |
O4 |
5133 |
|
20/12/1935 |
|