Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 88 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1122 Week
» 23628 Month
» 326818 Year
» 1548383 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3296
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6338   19/06/1937
O4 6211   02/12/1939
O4 5133   29/06/1942
O4 3668   07/09/1946
O4 63639   20/08/1949