Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 143 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1177 Week
» 23683 Month
» 326873 Year
» 1548438 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1856
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1971   02/1919
O4 155   12/06/1920
O4 6348   08/03/1930
O4 6323   02/07/1932
O4 6632   05/01/1935