Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 620 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4358 Week
» 1871 Month
» 229755 Year
» 1451320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1081
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6285   31/03/1934
O4 5011   01/05/1936
O4 5389   30/07/1938
O4 5400   24/08/1940
O4 6583   25/04/1942
O4 3838   09/11/1946
O4 63833   20/03/1948