Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 525 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 1776 Month
» 229660 Year
» 1451225 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #867
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1836   12/1917
O4 6275   20/05/1933
O4 6280   12/10/1935
O4 6281   18/12/1937
O4 6594   27/07/1940
O4 5400   12/02/1944
O4 6366   11/05/1946
O4 63692   25/09/1948