Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 329 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7336 Week
» 13470 Month
» 241354 Year
» 1462919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3350
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6323   05/11/1938
O4 6531   11/01/1941
O4 5013   12/06/1943
O4 5400   13/04/1946
O4 63688   22/01/1949
O4 63829   29/07/1950