Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 720 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2059 Week
» 31557 Month
» 368403 Year
» 1589968 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1949
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 402   28/07/1923
O4 5350   15/12/1928
O4 6202   01/08/1931
O4 6572   23/12/1933
O4 6498   01/02/1936
O4 6321   07/08/1938
O4 6533   21/09/1940
O4 6296   13/02/1943