Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1054 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18857 Week
» 71873 Month
» 191400 Year
» 3218253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1869
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
382 |
|
25/09/1920 |
O4 |
6374 |
|
01/06/1929 |
O4 |
6510 |
|
15/10/1931 |
O4 |
5403 |
|
19/05/1934 |
O4 |
6521 |
|
05/09/1936 |
O4 |
6576 |
|
22/04/1939 |
O4 |
6632 |
|
17/05/1941 |
|