Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 494 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1593 Week
» 7727 Month
» 235611 Year
» 1457176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1861
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1203   01/09/1920
O4 6201   24/08/1927
O4 6595   28/11/1931
O4 5019   05/08/1933
O4 5403   29/08/1936