Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 609 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4347 Week
» 1860 Month
» 229744 Year
» 1451309 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1883
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1215   04/06/1921
O4 5377   03/08/1929
O4 6229   06/08/1931
O4 6588   27/01/1934
O4 6368   09/05/1936
O4 5403   01/10/1938
O4 6496   04/01/1941
O4 6349   08/05/1943