Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 818 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 4141 Week
» 18398 Month
» 246282 Year
» 1467847 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1443
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 404   03/1912
O4 1249   01/12/1917
O4 1859   03/1918
O4 1245   14/01/1922
O4 6543   04/11/1933
O4 6297   05/10/1935
O4 6511   04/11/1937