Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 560 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4298 Week
» 1811 Month
» 229695 Year
» 1451260 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1852
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1962   01/1919
O4 392   08/05/1920
O4 5404   14/06/1924
O4 6251   18/03/1933
O4 6621   02/10/1937
O4 6194   09/03/1940
O4 6329   04/09/1943
O4 63790   06/08/1949