Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 153 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5374 Week
» 20488 Month
» 323678 Year
» 1545243 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #811
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5404   30/07/1927
O4 6301   07/02/1931
O4 6188   11/02/1933
O4 6321   07/07/1936
O4 6306   05/11/1938
O4 6292   17/08/1940
O4 6553   05/09/1942
O4 6365   23/06/1945
O4 3581   23/08/1947
O4 63714   11/02/1950