Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 115 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7575 Week
» 5088 Month
» 232972 Year
» 1454537 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #514
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1679   06/1918
O4 5404   18/10/1930
O4 5397   13/08/1932
O4 6289   30/11/1935
O4 6539   02/05/1938