Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 701 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4300 Week
» 10434 Month
» 238318 Year
» 1459883 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1389
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1694   01/1919
O4 6220   28/05/1925
O4 6226   15/02/1930
O4 5404   23/07/1932
O4 6241   05/06/1937