Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 355 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7362 Week
» 13496 Month
» 241380 Year
» 1462945 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3274
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6609   06/02/1937
O4 6370   22/07/1939
O4 5404   03/01/1942
O4 6361   29/04/1944
O4 3912   12/10/1946
O4 63778   06/08/1949