Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 504 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1603 Week
» 7737 Month
» 235621 Year
» 1457186 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3299
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6574   10/07/1937
O4 6599   14/10/1939
O4 6521   29/11/1941
O4 5404   25/03/1944
O4 6376   11/05/1946
O4 63873   04/12/1948