Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1268 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7657 Week
» 28099 Month
» 364945 Year
» 1586510 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1944
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1676   05/1918
O4 405   13/05/1922
O4 5012   06/08/1926
O4 6498   27/01/1931
O4 6332   31/12/1932
O4 6574   23/03/1935
O4 6258   24/07/1937