Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 463 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1562 Week
» 7696 Month
» 235580 Year
» 1457145 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1448
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 408   05/1912
O4 6201   29/08/1924
O4 6209   13/08/1927
O4 5405   09/11/1929
O4 6597   02/04/1932