Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 48 Today
» 1367 Yesterday
» 6582 Week
» 6582 Month
» 195717 Year
» 1417282 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1350
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6353   24/07/1928
O4 5405   03/06/1933
O4 6304   12/06/1935
O4 6598   24/09/1938
O4 6591   21/12/1940