Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 208 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5429 Week
» 20543 Month
» 323733 Year
» 1545298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1235
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6243   15/02/1933
O4 6341   06/07/1935
O4 5405   02/10/1937
O4 6522   25/05/1940
O4 6619   28/09/1942
O4 5407   21/10/1944
O4 3804   08/02/1947
O4 63759   02/04/1949