Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 256 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1482 Week
» 21127 Month
» 55769 Year
» 1277334 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3664
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5405   06/04/1940
O4 6586   14/03/1942
O4 6249   29/07/1944
O4 3880   22/02/1947
O4 63595   24/06/1950