Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 777 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4376 Week
» 10510 Month
» 238394 Year
» 1459959 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3661
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15D
Firebox Type Round Top
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6300   17/02/1940
O4 5390   14/11/1942
O4 5405   13/10/1945
O4 3616   06/03/1948