Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1083 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 7129 Week
» 26774 Month
» 61416 Year
» 1282981 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #805
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6365   04/06/1927
O4 6203   17/02/1931
O4 6247   23/09/1933
O4 6375   04/05/1935
O4 5347   10/10/1936
O4 5406   14/10/1939
O4 6190   10/10/1942
O4 5380   16/09/1944
O4 63697   08/01/1949