Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 71 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1105 Week
» 23611 Month
» 326801 Year
» 1548366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #859
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2116   07/1919
O4 6583   11/02/1933
O4 6345   02/03/1935
O4 6585   08/05/1937
O4 5347   07/10/1939
O4 6200   24/10/1942
O4 5406   16/12/1944