Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 107 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5328 Week
» 20442 Month
» 323632 Year
» 1545197 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1885
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1234   25/06/1921
O4 407   22/12/1923
O4 6205   22/12/1928
O4 6256   27/01/1931
O4 6320   20/05/1933
O4 6325   30/08/1935
O4 6516   21/08/1937