Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 100 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5321 Week
» 20435 Month
» 323625 Year
» 1545190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #813
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6190   17/09/1927
O4 6531   14/11/1931
O4 6365   07/07/1934
O4 6228   08/01/1938
O4 6240   09/03/1940
O4 5407   26/09/1942
O4 6503   25/11/1944