Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #863
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1727   09/1919
O4 6250   04/03/1933
O4 6376   28/06/1935
O4 6631   19/12/1936
O4 6343   20/08/1938
O4 6194   10/04/1943
O4 5348   24/11/1945
O4 63677   22/01/1949