Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 653 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1940 Week
» 31526 Month
» 405539 Year
» 1627104 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1881
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 408   21/05/1921
O4 6293   02/03/1927
O4 6215   04/06/1929
O4 6273   09/05/1931
O4 6256   06/05/1933
O4 6196   17/08/1935
O4 6545   09/07/1938
O4 6506   15/03/1941