Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 609 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3254 Week
» 5836 Month
» 270469 Year
» 1492034 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #655
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5069   14/11/1925
O4 6188   24/05/1930
O4 6358   18/03/1933
O4 6495   19/12/1936
O4 6582   04/02/1939
O4 6520   16/08/1941