Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3223
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6564   14/12/1935
O4 6617   19/03/1938
O4 6311   08/06/1940
O4 6496   20/03/1943
O4 5069   18/09/1943
O4 3637   05/07/1947
O4 63631   27/08/1949