Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1967
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6256   10/05/1924
O4 6559   03/03/1931
O4 6630   27/01/1934
O4 6625   14/12/1935
O4 6196   18/06/1938
O4 767   04/10/1941